MD SB574 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain reporting requirement relating to an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain materials, parts, and equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or certain aircraft systems; and repealing the termination date of the exemption.
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Extension of Sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743225/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {343221/1 Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Tax - General | 11 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |