MD SB578 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the principal of a public school to require a student to serve an in-school suspension for cause; and authorizing the principal of a public school to require a parent or guardian of a student serving an in-school suspension to attend 1 day of the in-school suspension with the student for a conference with appropriate school personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Student Discipline - In-School Suspensions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2019-02-12SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback