MD SB579 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a park model recreational vehicle is considered to be a travel trailer for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining the term "park model recreational vehicle"; and making specified conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407
2016-04-11SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2016-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-04-08HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2016-03-29HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback