MD SB584 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain transferee of a Class B-D-7 license to apply to the Board of License Commissioners to exchange the license for a Class A-7 license under certain circumstances; establishing an Inner Harbor Park license; authorizing the Board to issue no more than two licenses to a nonprofit organization that is operated to promote and care for the Inner Harbor waterfront; authorizing the holder of a public market license to designate a vendor to sell certain alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at a certain restaurant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {263391/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {183120/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {284037/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0584&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0584f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0584t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0584e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_677_sb0584e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0584_18312001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0584_28403701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0584_26339101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0584.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0584_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0620.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0584_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1433.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1387.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback