MD SB585 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain definition of "absconding" as it relates to parole and probation, to include leaving an inpatient residential treatment facility in which an individual was placed under court order for drug or alcohol treatment without the permission of an administrator; requiring, for fiscal years 2024 through 2026, the Governor to include in the annual budget an appropriation of $2,000,000 for warrant apprehension grants; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the grant funds.
Title
Public Safety - Warrants and Absconding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {873224/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253729/1 Adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Warrants
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 6 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 4 | 1011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |