MD SB590 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an inmate in a State or local correctional facility from being placed in specified solitary confinement unless specified conditions are met; requiring a correctional facility to maintain specified documentation and make specified periodic reports to the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; and requiring the Department to make specified information available on the Department's Web site.
Title
Correctional Services - Solitary Confinement - Restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Electronic Government
Health
Mental Health
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Electronic Government
Health
Mental Health
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports