MD SB595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education to award credit to a middle school student for any course for which a high school student would be awarded credit if the middle school student meets the same requirements as the high school student.
Title
Education - Middle School Students - Awarding of Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {354634/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Education
Education, Boards of
Examinations
Grants
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Community Colleges
Education
Education, Boards of
Examinations
Grants
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition