MD SB610 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to adopt a local law that authorizes the county or municipal corporation to revoke or not renew the business license of an establishment for the second or subsequent conviction of an employee of the establishment if the violation involves selling or delivering drug paraphernalia to a minor and occurs on the property of the business establishment.
Title
Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-02-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2012-02-08 | Re-assigned Finance | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Minors
Municipal Corporations