MD SB611 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Healthy School Facility Fund to provide grants to public primary and secondary schools in the State to improve the health of school facilities; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to establish award procedures to make awards distributed from the Fund not more than 45 days after receiving an application; requiring the Governor in each of fiscal years 2020 and 2021 to appropriate at least $30,000,000 to the Fund; requiring the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Title
Education – Healthy School Facility Fund – Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-33) (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-33) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {914231/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Emergency Bills
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Interest
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Emergency Bills
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Interest
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes