MD SB622 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "amusement device" as it relates to the operation and regulation of amusement devices in Washington County to include a game activated by an object or other consideration of value; and altering the definition of "gross profits" as it relates to the operation of tip jars in Washington County to require the deduction of the cost of a gaming sticker.
Title
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |