MD SB626 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the St. Mary's County Board of Education to negotiate with specified employee organizations for employees a reasonable service fee to be charged nonmember noncertificated employees for representing the employees in specified matters; and making the Act applicable only to specified employees hired on or after a specified date.
Title
St. Mary's County - Noncertificated Public School Employees - Service Fee
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (42-4) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Fees
Public Employees
Public Schools
St. Mary`s County
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Fees
Public Employees
Public Schools
St. Mary`s County
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment