MD SB626 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the surviving spouse of a deceased disabled veteran be at least 65 years old to qualify for a certain exemption to vehicle registration fees.
Title
Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798372/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Death
Disabilities
Exemptions
Fees
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Spouses
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Veterans
Disabilities
Exemptions
Fees
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Spouses
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Veterans