MD SB635 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing an exemption for certain procurements from Maryland Correctional Enterprises from the calculation of total procurement spending for the purpose of calculating a unit's Minority Business Enterprise Program participation rate.
Title
Minority Business Enterprises – Calculation of Participation Rates – Exemption for Procurements From Maryland Correctional Enterprises – Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB635 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1302 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1302 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business
Correctional Institutions
Industry and Technology
Minorities
Prices
Prisoners
Procurement
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Correctional Institutions
Industry and Technology
Minorities
Prices
Prisoners
Procurement
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0635?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0635f.pdf |