MD SB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing voters who have declined to affiliate with a political party to affiliate with a party at any time individuals may register to vote; altering provisions concerning the timing of requests to affiliate with a party to conform with the procedures for early voting; altering provisions relating to early voting to allow voters who have declined to affiliate with a political party to affiliate with a party and be issued a ballot to vote; etc.
Title
Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |