MD SB642 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing funds from video lottery proceeds that are used for grants for investment capital and loans to small, minority, and women-owned businesses surrounding the video lottery facility in Allegany County to be used for those purposes anywhere in Allegany County; specifying that any remaining funds may be allocated to small, minority, and women-owned businesses located in areas served by the Tri-County Council for Western Maryland; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Allegany County
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Gaming
Garrett County
Grants
Investments
Loans
Minorities
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Washington County
Women
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Gaming
Garrett County
Grants
Investments
Loans
Minorities
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Washington County
Women