MD SB648 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Effect of the Drug Ritalin on School Children; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to conduct public hearings; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Effect of the Drug Ritalin on School Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Education, State Department of
Health
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Reports
Students
Sunset
Drugs
Education, State Department of
Health
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Reports
Students
Sunset