MD SB65 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each retail service station dealer to maintain at least one operational video camera on the exterior of the premises of the service station for the purpose of recording illegal activity; requiring that the video camera be capable of recording an image of an individual that is of sufficient quality to enable identification of the individual for the purpose of investigation or prosecution of suspected illegal activity; establishing a penalty for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Identification
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Service Stations
Video
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Identification
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Service Stations
Video