MD SB658 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a public service company from terminating, under specified circumstances, electric or gas service to a residential customer during a severe weather period for a severe weather event and on specified days; prohibiting a public service company, on receipt of a specified request or subsequent request, from terminating, under specified circumstances, electric or gas service to a residential customer for 30 days beyond a scheduled termination of service date under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Emergencies
Fuel
Licenses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Emergencies
Fuel
Licenses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather