MD SB659 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, under specified circumstances, a bidder to disclose specified information regarding whether services required under a procurement contract will be performed outside the United States; prohibiting a public employer from knowingly contracting for specified services unless the services are to be provided in the United States, except under specified circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
State Procurement - Disclosure - Location of the Performance of Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (137-1) | |
2012-04-06 | Conference Committee Report 593427/1 Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Oaks, and Ready | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-03 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 586085/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2012-04-06 | Conference Committee Report 593427/1 Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Senators Pinsky, Reilly, and Montgomery | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 234635/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 234635/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Grants
International Affairs
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Special Tax Districts
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Grants
International Affairs
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Special Tax Districts
Work, Labor and Employment