MD SB669 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person may be debarred from entering into a contract with the State if the person, or a specified other person connected to the person, has been convicted of a violation of specified provisions of federal law or State law or, under specified circumstances, has been found to have willfully or knowingly violated specified provisions of State law.
Title
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of Law
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {686281/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434037/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Contractors
Contracts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Fraud
Occupational Safety
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contracts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Fraud
Occupational Safety
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment