MD SB677 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program in the State Department of Education to be the Hearing Aid and Language and Communication Video Loan Bank Program; requiring the Loan Bank to lend language and communication videos and certain downloadable resources to the parents or legal guardians of deaf or hard of hearing children; exempting the parent or legal guardian of a deaf or hard of hearing child from paying tuition for a course that teaches a language or communication mode at a public institution of higher education; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {676089/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-04HouseHearing canceled
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {984630/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0677&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0677f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0677t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0677e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0677_98463001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0677_67608901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0677.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0677_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0677_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0691.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0677_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1509.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1407.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback