MD SB693 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting freestanding birthing centers from the requirement to have a certificate of need to operate; requiring nurse-midwives who are employed by hospitals to meet specified credentialing requirements; authorizing certified nurse-midwives to be granted admission privileges at hospitals; prohibiting the State Board of Nursing from requiring certified nurse-midwives to have written practice protocols for specified purposes with physicians; requiring the Board to post and make available specified information; etc.
Title
Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice Privileges
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals
Licenses
Midwives
Nurses
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals
Licenses
Midwives
Nurses
Public Health
Public Information
Records