MD SB696 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified lien information that must be included in specified statements that accompany the recordation of an affidavit of affixation for a manufactured home under specified circumstances.
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |