MD SB702 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that artwork funded by the Maryland Public Art Initiative Program is the property of the Maryland Commission on Public Art; providing that the Commission is responsible for the inventory, maintenance, and preservation of specified artwork; requiring the State to include public art in all construction projects and major renovation projects under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-9) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-9) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547579/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547579/1 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Economic and Community Development
General Services, Department of
Grants
Historical Matters
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Economic and Community Development
General Services, Department of
Grants
Historical Matters
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism