MD SB705 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a firefighter, an emergency medical technician, a rescue squad member, or any other first responder engaged in providing emergency medical care or rescue services; and applying specified penalties.
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {848878/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Assault
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Penalties and Sentences
Rescue Squads
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Penalties and Sentences
Rescue Squads