MD SB727 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 25% to 28% over a 4-year period the percentage of the federal earned income credit used for determining the amount that an individual may claim as a refundable credit under the Maryland earned income credit.
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Credit - Refundable Amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {199731/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |