MD SB727 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program in the Department of Health to provide grants to certain fire departments and volunteer fire companies to procure innovative cancer screening tests not generally conducted during routine physical exams or covered by insurance for the purpose of reducing cancer mortality among professional and volunteer firefighters; requiring the Governor for certain fiscal years to include at least $100,000 in the budget for the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-05HouseHearing canceled
2019-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04HouseHearing canceled
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
2019-04-03HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-03HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-04-02HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {927676/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback