MD SB734 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the performing arts theater beer and wine license in Harford County; establishing in Harford County a performing arts nonprofit organization license that authorizes the holder to sell or serve beer, wine, and liquor at certain locations for on-premises consumption; requiring the holder of the license to comply with certain record-keeping and reporting requirements; and establishing an annual license fee of $750 for the license.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {523525/1 (Delegate Reilly) Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903828/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {903021/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB635 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Comptroller
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Food
Forms
Harford County
Hearings
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Comptroller
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Food
Forms
Harford County
Hearings
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1005.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |