MD SB739 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the State Board of Education to add two regular members who are certified teachers with certain experience and a parent of a student enrolled in a public school; prohibiting the two teacher members from being employed by the same county board of education; requiring the Governor to appoint certain teacher members with the advice and consent of the Senate from certain lists; authorizing certain teacher members to attend and participate in executive sessions of the State Board; etc.
Title
State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-12) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-46) (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-46) (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (91-46) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {915864/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2018-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564630/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Elections
Governor
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Teachers
Voting
Education, State Department of
Elections
Governor
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Teachers
Voting