MD SB739 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to ensure that every child in the State has access to a child advocacy center; requiring and authorizing child advocacy centers to assist in the response to or investigation of allegations of child abuse and neglect and a crime of violence in the presence of a minor; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to contract with a certain nonprofit organization to establish a Maryland Statewide Organization for Child Advocacy Centers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {488470/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback