MD SB740 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a county to enact a local law to provide for a certain innovative development competition for purposes of encouraging development proposals from private entities by granting cash prizes to projects selected by a certain Board to foster certain types of innovation; providing that a prize awarded through an innovative development competition may not exceed $250,000 and shall be matched by the State Innovative Development Fund, and may only be used to implement a winning project; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties – Innovative Development Competitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2019-02-28SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback