MD SB740 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period within which a court may prohibit a person convicted under certain circumstances of operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol from operating a vessel on the waters of the State; requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in coordination with the Natural Resources Police Force, to establish and maintain a database of persons prohibited from operating a vessel on the waters of the State due to a certain conviction for operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol; etc.
Title
Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Gile [D] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {293827/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB770 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Electronic Documents
Fines
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Electronic Documents
Fines
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |