MD SB745 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a prepaid wireless E 9-1-1 fee of 60 cents per retail transaction; providing that the fee shall be collected for specified transactions in the State for the purpose of contributing to the 9-1-1 Trust Fund; authorizing specified percentages of the money collected from the fee to be used for specified purposes; providing that the fee is not subject to the sales and use tax; authorizing a seller to demonstrate a specified exemption from the fee in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone Systems - Prepaid Service - Collection of Surcharge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-8) (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-8) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {127376/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Disclosure
Emergencies
Fees
Liability
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Comptroller
Disclosure
Emergencies
Fees
Liability
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones