MD SB747 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a District Court Commissioner, in a specified interim protective order, and a judge, in a temporary protective order or final protective order, to award temporary possession of any pet of a person eligible for relief or a respondent; etc.
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief - Award of Temporary Possession of Pet
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-9) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-19 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Domestic Violence
Judges
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Domestic Violence
Judges
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Victims