MD SB747 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to provide a county superintendent of schools, if the State Superintendent plans to remove the county superintendent, with the reason for removal, documentation to support the case for removal, and the opportunity to request a hearing within 10 days; authorizing a county board of education to remove a county superintendent in a certain manner; and authorizing a county superintendent to appeal a certain decision by the county board to the State Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {653020/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-05HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (43-1)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {983125/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
2019-04-02SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Lam) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFloor Amendment {653020/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted (31-15)
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {624638/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRecommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Lam)
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {764431/1
2019-03-06SenateSpecial Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {764431/1
2019-03-05SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {764431/1
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0747&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0747f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0747t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0747_76443101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0747_62463801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0747_65302001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0747_98312501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0747.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0747_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0924.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1093.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0747_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1456.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback