MD SB752 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing procedures for arbitration of collective bargaining disputes involving the exclusive representative of sworn law enforcement officers in the Charles County Sheriff's Office; authorizing any party to a collective bargaining agreement to declare a bargaining impasse under specified circumstances; establishing a specified method for selecting an arbitrator; requiring the parties to submit specified memoranda to the arbitrator on or before January 1; etc.
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Arbitration
Charles County
Circuit Courts
Collective Bargaining
Consumer Price Index
Contracts
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Discipline
Education
Evidence
Fees
Hearings
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Notices
Oaths
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Subpoenas
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Charles County
Circuit Courts
Collective Bargaining
Consumer Price Index
Contracts
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Discipline
Education
Evidence
Fees
Hearings
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Notices
Oaths
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Subpoenas
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment