MD SB752 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration, in collaboration with county governing bodies, to develop and adopt by regulation a policy concerning sound barriers along highways in the State; requiring, on or before December 31, 2019, and every 3 years thereafter, the Administration to review and evaluate the specified policy for effectiveness and continued viability; requiring the Administration to make a specified report regarding sound barriers to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than December 1, 2017; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along Highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {607771/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Counties
County Councils
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Noise
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Transportation - Highways
County Councils
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Noise
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Transportation - Highways