MD SB755 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual in a restaurant, club, or hotel for which a specified alcoholic beverages license is issued the privilege of consuming wine not purchased from or provided by the license holder; requiring, for an individual to exercise the privilege, that the wine be consumed under specified circumstances; requiring a local licensing board to issue a specified permit at no cost to specified license holders; authorizing a license holder to determine and charge an individual a fee for the privilege; etc.
Title
Consuming Wine Not Bought on Premises - Restaurants, Clubs, and Hotels
Sponsors
Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (134-4) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Hotels and Motels
Restaurants
Sales and Use Tax
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Hotels and Motels
Restaurants
Sales and Use Tax