MD SB755 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to include in an annual report to be submitted to certain committees of the General Assembly and the Department of Legislative Services by December 1 each year information on interagency agreements with historically black colleges and universities, including the total percentage of interagency contracts with historically black colleges and universities by agency or unit and any recommendations for regulatory or statutory changes to address certain barriers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interagency Agreements – Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {654233/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback