MD SB767 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making victims of certain crimes involving the operation of a vessel or motor vehicle eligible for payment of a claim through the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (138-1) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-04-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Motor Vehicles
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Motor Vehicles