MD SB770 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging each county board of education, beginning in the 2018-2019 school year, to implement a specified agriculture science curriculum in at least one public high school in each county or at least one career and technology education center in each county; and requiring that the agriculture science curriculum be selected from existing curricula developed by the State Department of Education or be developed by a county board and approved by the Department.
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Agriculture Science
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Wayne Norman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {404135/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools