MD SB771 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law that requires a teacher preparation program to require a student to pass a certain assessment as a graduation requirement; altering the requirements for initial teacher certification; authorizing a local school system to establish a comprehensive induction program to aid in meeting a certain requirement for initial teacher certification; and altering the qualification requirements for a teacher who holds a professional license or certificate from another state.
Title
Education - Initial Teacher Certification - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {273627/1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB945 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Subjects
Certifications
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Literacy
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
School Testing
Students
Teachers
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Literacy
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
School Testing
Students
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 6 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |