MD SB773 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering, from 20% to 25%, the percentage of an expert's professional activities that may have been devoted to certain activities that directly involve testimony in personal injury claims during the 12 months immediately before the date when the claim was first filed in order for the expert to qualify to testify in relation to a certain proceeding; establishing that a certain health care provider shall be deemed to have met a certain requirement during the pendency of a claim under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-3)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-05HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {338570/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback