MD SB786 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing and strengthening consumer protections in certain areas of financial transactions, including mobile home purchases, security breaches, vehicle purchases, money transmission, and other areas; applying certain existing financial consumer protections to new forms of financial transactions; establishing that a mobile home retailer has a duty of good faith and fair dealing; prohibiting a mobile home retailer from steering a consumer borrower to products that offer less favorable terms; etc.
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Credit
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Financial Institutions
Genetics
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Mortgages
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Credit
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Financial Institutions
Genetics
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Mortgages
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Transportation