MD SB787 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Garrett County to enact a local law and adopt regulations relating to the location of any marijuana facility in Garrett County.
Title
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |