MD SB79 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability to the support required from the destitute adult child's parent if the parent has or is able to earn sufficient means to provide the support; providing that a court may divide the support obligation for the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability between the destitute adult child's parents in proportion to the parents' income; etc.
Title
Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-10-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Developmental Disabilities
Family Law
Health
Vulnerable Adults
Civil Actions and Procedures
Developmental Disabilities
Family Law
Health
Vulnerable Adults