MD SB794 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to select and monitor a coordinating entity to oversee the Project; establishing the purpose of the Project; requiring the coordinating entity to be selected through a competitive request for proposal or by sole source contract; requiring the coordinating entity to determine the number and characteristics of specified unaccompanied homeless youth and young adults; etc.
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2014-04-04 | House | Motion Reconsider Committee Amendment (Delegate James) Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate James) Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {124468/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944631/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Children
Contracts
Hagerstown
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Planning, Department of
Prince George's County
Privatization
Procurement
Public Schools
Reports
Social Services - Generally
Somerset County
Washington County
Wicomico County
Worcester County
Youth
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Children
Contracts
Hagerstown
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Planning, Department of
Prince George's County
Privatization
Procurement
Public Schools
Reports
Social Services - Generally
Somerset County
Washington County
Wicomico County
Worcester County
Youth