MD SB798 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each institution of higher education to develop and adopt a policy on student concerns about athletic programs and activities that meets certain requirements on or before October 1, 2019; requiring each institution of higher education to post the policy and any changes to the policy on the institution's website and to submit the policy to the Maryland Higher Education Commission and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-30) (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 507
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (108-30)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-18SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback