MD SB816 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a beer, wine, and liquor tasting license in Cecil County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Cecil County to issue the beer, wine, and liquor tasting license to a holder of a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license; authorizing the license holder to allow on-premises consumption of beer, wine, and liquor for tasting; specifying the term of the license; requiring a license holder to provide specified notice before exercising specified privileges; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Cecil County
Committees and Commissions
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Cecil County
Committees and Commissions
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices