MD SB818 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an appointing authority to apply a credit of five points on a selection test for specified positions in the State Personnel Management System for an individual with a specified disability; requiring a specified appointing authority for a specified position in the Executive Branch of State government to develop a hiring preference for an individual with a specified disability that is equivalent to the credit applied on a specified selection test; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Individuals With Disabilities - Hiring Preferences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {404868/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-01 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {427075/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Mental Health
Public Officials
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Mental Health
Public Officials
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment